Brown v. Tromba et al
Plaintiff: Marlon Lorenzo Brown
Defendant: Sgt Tromba, Easy Bail LLC, Clark County Nevada, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Mike Slyman, Donte Tromba, Eighth Judicial District Court, Joseph Lombardo, Damian R. Sheets/Mayfield, Grubar, Sheets, Gary A. Modafferi, American Surety, Faller, City of Las Vegas, Michael Slyman, American Surety Company, Gary Modafferi, Damian Sheets, Steve Wolfson, Danae Adams, Bruce Nelson, Dante Tromba and Clark County District Attorney's Office
Case Number: 2:2017cv02396
Filed: September 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A Leen
2 Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 123 REPLY to Response to #116 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. (Anderson, Lyssa)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Granting #120 Motion to Extend Time and #121 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). Replies re #116 Motion to Dismiss due by 1/20/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Reply re #116 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. (Anderson, Lyssa) (extend) (sumjgm)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Reply re #116 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. Responses due by 1/27/2023. (Anderson, Lyssa) (sumjgm)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RESPONSE to #116 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Replies due by 1/13/2023. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Granting #117 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY re 115 Minute Order, by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. (Anderson, Lyssa) (stay) (nondispositive)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION to Dismiss #114 Amended Complaint by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. Responses due by 1/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Anderson, Lyssa)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/12/2022. IT IS ORDERED that the parties must file a proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by 12/23/2022.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Fourth AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba, Donte Tromba by Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Removes parties. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting #105 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Marlon Brown may file a fourth amended complaint consistent with this order. Failure to file a fourth amended complaint by 12/9/2022 will result in dismissal of all claims against defendants Clark County and Steve Wolfson with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Dante Tromba's motion to dismiss (ECF No. #101 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Marlon Brown may file a fourth amended complaint consistent with this order. Failure to file a fourth amended complaint by December 9, 2022 will result in dismissal of all claims against defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Dante Tromba with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Third Amended Complaint* in this action was filed on* 9/21/2020.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*City of Las Vegas and Joseph Lombardo.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 12/9/2022. (EDS)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 REPLY to Response to #105 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Clark County District Attorney's Office, Clark County Nevada, Steve Wolfson. (Rogan, Jeffrey)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE to #105 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Replies due by 8/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting #106 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Granting #104 Stipulation to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Second STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY by Defendants Clark County District Attorney's Office, Clark County Nevada, Steve Wolfson. (Rogan, Jeffrey) (stay) (nondispositive)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION to Dismiss #44 Amended Complaint, by Defendants Clark County District Attorney's Office, Clark County Nevada, Steve Wolfson. Responses due by 7/29/2022. (Rogan, Jeffrey)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION TO DISMISS Certain County Defendants by Defendants Clark County District Attorney's Office, Clark County Nevada, Steve Wolfson. (Rogan, Jeffrey) (dismiss)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 REPLY to Response to #101 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. (Anderson, Lyssa)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RESPONSE to #101 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Replies due by 6/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit) (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss #44 Third Amended Complaint, by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. Responses due by 6/17/2022. (Anderson, Lyssa)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #98 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/17/2022. Motions due by 11/16/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/26/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/19/2022. The parties have not filed a proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order consistent with the Court's order at ECF No. #82 . Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that a proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is due by 4/25/2022.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #86 plaintiffs motion for leave to amend the third amended complaint is DENIED in part and GRANTED in limited part, consistent with this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #67 defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Dante Trombas motion to dismiss the third amended complaint is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #93 defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Dante Trombas motion for leave to file a surreply is DENIED as moot. Amended Complaint deadline: 2/18/2022. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/24/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPLY to Response to #93 Motion for Leave to File Document by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. (Kalkowski, Kristopher)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RESPONSE to #93 Motion for Leave to File Document by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Replies due by 8/3/2021. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiff Marlon Brown's #86 Fifth Motion to Amend, by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. (Anderson, Lyssa)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 REPLY to Response to #86 Motion to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 REPLY to Response to #86 Motion to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 RESPONSE to #86 Motion to Amend/Correct by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. Replies due by 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Anderson, Lyssa)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 RESPONSE to #86 Motion to Amend/Correct by Defendants Clark County District Attorney's Office, Clark County Nevada, Steve Wolfson. Replies due by 7/9/2021. (Rogan, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting #87 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #86 Motion to Amend/Correct. Responses due by 7/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File a Response re #86 Fifth Motion to Amend, by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. (Anderson, Lyssa)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Fifth MOTION to Amend #44 Third Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 6/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #73 Plaintiffs motion to amend is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a motion to amend, if he so desires, by 6/4/2021 or after the parties amend their discovery plan and scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/18/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Withdrawal re 48 Motion for Summary Judgment in Consolidated Case 2:19-cv-01350-APG-BNW by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba re #83 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,,,,,. (Anderson, Lyssa)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Marlon Browns motions to consolidate 2:17- cv-02396-APG-BNW, #41 and 2:19-cv-01350-APG-DJA, 38 are GRANTED. Case Nos. 2:17-cv-02396-APG-BNW and 2:19-cv-01350-APG-DJA are consolidated, with Case No. 2:17-cv-02396-APG-BNW serving as the lead case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 47 plaintiff Marlon Browns motion to voluntarily dismiss (2:19- cv-01350-APG-DJA), is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by 4/9/2021, defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Dante Tromba shall file a notice in the lead case. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/18/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting #81 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION re Discovery Stay re #62 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, #70 Motion by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. (Anderson, Lyssa)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Withdrawal re #74 Response to #70 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Marlon Lorenzo Brown (Mcavoyamaya, Michael) Modified text on 3/5/2021 and linked to motion (MMM).
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPLY to Response to #73 Motion to Amend/Correct, by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael) Modified text on 3/3/2021 and corrected document link (MMM).
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ERROR: Incorrect image attached. Correct image filed at ecf no. #79 . REPLY to Response to #73 Motion to Amend/Correct, by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael) Document #78 terminated as filed in error. Modified on 3/3/2021 (MMM).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE to #73 Motion to Amend/Correct, by Defendants Clark County District Attorney's Office, Clark County Nevada, Steve Wolfson. Replies due by 3/2/2021. (Rogan, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE to #73 Motion to Amend/Correct, by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. Replies due by 3/2/2021. (Anderson, Lyssa)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPLY to Response to #70 Motion by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. (Anderson, Lyssa)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RESPONSE to #70 Motion by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Replies due by 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Fourth MOTION to Amend/Correct #44 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Prop. 4th Amend. Comp., #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-29 to FAC, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 30-36 to FAC, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 37-42 to FAC, #5 Exhibit Exhibits 43-46 to FAC, #6 Exhibit Exhibits 47-53 to FAC) (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 WITHDRAWAL of #71 Motion to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Fourth MOTION to Amend/Correct #44 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 67] re #67 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. Responses due by 2/9/2021. (Anderson, Lyssa)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 REPLY to Response to #67 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. (Anderson, Lyssa)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE to #67 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Replies due by 1/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss #44 Amended Complaint, by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dante Tromba. Responses due by 1/19/2021. (Anderson, Lyssa)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Dante Tromba. (Anderson, Lyssa)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dante Tromba. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Anderson, Lyssa)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint, filed by Dante Tromba.(Anderson, Lyssa)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #61 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/2/2021. Motions due by 7/2/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/8/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Summons Issued as to Donte Tromba. (JQC)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/21/2020. On September 17, 2020, the Court granted Plaintiff's motion to amend and allowed him to file his third amended complaint. ECF No. 43. The Court further ordered the Clerk of Court to file Plaintiff's third amended complaint as a separate docket entry, which the Clerk did at ECF No. 44. Subsequently, it appears Plaintiff filed another third amended complaint at ECF No. 45. So that the record is clear, the Court directs the Clerk of Court to strike ECF No. 45 from the docket. If Plaintiff wishes to file a fourth amended complaint, he may file an appropriate motion to amend. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EG)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Anderson, Lyssa)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Anderson, Lyssa)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint filed by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department.(Anderson, Lyssa) Modified on 10/21/2020 to add document link (MMM).
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County District Attorney's Office, Clark County Nevada, Steve Wolfson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rogan, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint, filed by Clark County District Attorney's Office, Clark County Nevada, Steve Wolfson. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/4/2020.(Rogan, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Summons Issued as to Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (JQC)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Summons Issued as to City of Las Vegas, Clark County District Attorney's Office, Clark County Nevada. (JQC)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 (1st Notice) Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that Timothy Revero is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #45 . Attorney Timothy Revero is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #45 . Attorney Michael J. McAvoyAmaya is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STRICKEN per 58 Minute Order Third AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants Plaintiffs by Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Adds and removes parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit) (Mcavoyamaya, Michael) Modified on 9/21/2020 (MMM). Modified on 10/21/2020 to strike (MMM).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against Danae Adams, City of Las Vegas, Clark County Nevada, Joseph Lombardo, Bruce Nelson, Donte Tromba, Steve Wolfson by Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Adds new parties. (JQC) Modified on 9/21/2020 to indicate Third (MMM). (Main Document 44 replaced on 9/23/2020) (JQC).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #40 Plaintiffs motion to amend is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF Nos. #39 , #40 , and #41 . Attorney Timothy E. Revero is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 9/9/2020. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Second Amended Complaint re #32 USCA Order by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Third Amended Complaint) (Mcavoyamaya, Michael) Modified on 8/27/2020 to reflect correct document links (MMM).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 WITHDRAWAL of #36 Motion to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #37 . Attorney Michael J. McAvoyAmaya is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Julian Mcavoyamaya on behalf of Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Amend Complaint, by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 5/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (JQC) Modified on 5/12/2020 to reflect date filed per postmark (MMM).
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER on Mandate as to #33 USCA Mandate re #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Marlon Lorenzo Brown. VACATING andREMANDING. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Marlon Lorenzo Brown, #32 USCA Order Vacating and Remanding Judgment of the District Court. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Marlon Lorenzo Brown. VACATED and REMANDED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified on 4/9/2020 (MMM).
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit as to #29 Notice of Appeal. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Marlon Lorenzo Brown. USCA Case Number 19-16504. Payment of the $505 docketing and filing fees is past due. Failure to correct this deficiency within 14 days will result in the dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #27 Order, #28 Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Filing Fee NOT Paid. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (ADR) Modified on 8/1/2019 to relate to judgment (ADR).
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 7/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #22 the Report of Findings and Recommendation is accepted, Brown's objection and #23 motion to stay is denied, and the plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #26 Brown's motion to file a Third Amended Complaint is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall enter Judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Attachments: #1 Third Amended Complaint - Modified on 7/9/2019 to restrict access pursuant to LR IC 6-1 (MMM).) (SLD)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:17-cv-02396-APG-BNW. (no image attached) (JQC)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Address updated to SDCC, PO Box 208, Indian Springs, NV 89070. (MMM)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OBJECTION to #22 Report and Recommendation, filed by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Response to Objections to R&R due by 3/6/2019. (ADR)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall MAIL Plaintiff Marlon Brown one blank form complaint for 1983 civil rights actions along with the instructions for completing the form, one copy of the Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. #14 ), and one copy of this Report of Findings and Recommendation. If Mr. Brown believes he can correct the noted deficiencies in his due process and equal protection claims, as well as any state tort claims for which the court may have supplemental jurisdiction, Mr. Brown shall file a new civil action containing only those claims and omitting any habeas corpus claims the court identified here.REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that #14 Marlon Brown's Second Amended Complaint be DISMISSED, without prejudice, in its entirety for failure to state a claim; that the Clerk of the Court be instructed to enter judgment accordingly. Objections to R&R due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Substitute Defendant John Doe. FURTHER ORDERED that #20 Motion to Serve Non-Government Defendants, or in the Alternative, for Screening Order is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Serve Non-Government Defendants, or in the Alternative, Motion for Screening Order by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 1/10/2019. (MMM)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Address updated to #1209358, High Desert State Prison, PO Box 650, Indian Springs, NV 89070. (MMM)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Substitute Defendant John Doe by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 12/3/2018. (MMM)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED that #16 Motion to Dismiss or Consolidate Cases is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/28/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss/or Consolidate Case 2:18-cv-00165-KJD-NJK, by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 9/5/2018. (MMM)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUPPORTING DOCUMENT to #14 Second Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown (MMM)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clark County Nevada, Easy Bail LLC, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joe Lombardo, Tromba, Faller, City of Las Vegas, Michael Slyman, American Surety Company, Gary Modafferi, Damian Sheets by Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Adds and removes parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - Modified on 5/23/2018 to restrict access pursuant to LR IC 6-1) (MMM)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 , #2 , #7 Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown's Applications to Proceed In Forma Pauperis are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #5 Plaintiff's Motion to Add Defendants to Complaint, #6 Motion to Add Defendants and Statutes to Complaint, #11 Motion to Add Causes of Action to Complaint, and #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint by 6/18/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Enc.: 1983 civil rights actions along with the instructions - ADR)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 5/28/2018.(MMM)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Add Cause of Action to Complaint by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 5/28/2018.(MMM)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 400.00, receipt number NVLAS056999 (MMM)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to #8 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown (SLD)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clark County Nevada, Easy Bail LLC, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Mike Slyman, Tromba, Eighth Judicial District Court, Joe Lombardo, Damian R. Sheets/Mayfield, Grubar, Sheets, Gary A. Modafferi, American Surety, filed by Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Adds new parties. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(MMM)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (MMM)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Add Following Defendants and Statues to Complaint by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 10/16/2017. (MMM)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Add Following Defendants to Complaint by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. Responses due by 10/13/2017. (MMM)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADDITION to Defendant List Proposal re Complaint (contained within #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis), filed by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (MMM)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MMM)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Ex Parte APPLICATION for Pauper Status by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (MMM)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Marlon Lorenzo Brown. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(MMM)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Tromba et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Tromba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easy Bail LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Nevada
Represented By: Jeffrey Rogan
Represented By: Jeffrey S Rogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Kristopher John Kalkowski
Represented By: Ryan W. Daniels
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Slyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donte Tromba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eighth Judicial District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damian R. Sheets/Mayfield, Grubar, Sheets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary A. Modafferi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Surety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Slyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Modafferi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damian Sheets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Wolfson
Represented By: Jeffrey Rogan
Represented By: Jeffrey S Rogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danae Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dante Tromba
Represented By: Kristopher John Kalkowski
Represented By: Ryan W. Daniels
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County District Attorney's Office
Represented By: Jeffrey Rogan
Represented By: Jeffrey S Rogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Lorenzo Brown
Represented By: Michael Julian Mcavoyamaya
Represented By: Timothy E. Revero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?