Centex Homes v. St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Centex Homes
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Lexington Insurance Company and St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv02407
Filed: September 14, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2018 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 112 Stipulation of Dismissal of St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 2, 2018 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking 109 Joint Rule 26., Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 26, 2018 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 102 Stipulation for Everest National Insurance Company to File a First Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 14, 2018 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 95 Stipulation; Everest National Insurance Company answer due 2/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 13, 2018 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Stipulation; Response to Third-Party Complaint due 14 days after ruling on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 12, 2018 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Stipulation; Arch Specialty Insurance Company answer due 2/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 1, 2018 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Stipulation; Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company answer due 2/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 30, 2018 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Stipulation; Arch Specialty Insurance Company answer due 2/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 26, 2018 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Stipulation; Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG answer due 2/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 17, 2018 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Stipulation; New Hampshire Insurance Company answer due 1/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 9, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Stipulation. Motion Hearing RE: Motion to Dismiss 15 reset for 12/18/2017 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
October 11, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation to Extend Time. St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company answer due 10/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centex Homes v. St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centex Homes
Represented By: Sarah J. Odia
Represented By: Scott S Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?