Gould et al v. Rogers et al

Plaintiff: Audree Gould and Dan Gould
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. and William Rogers
Case Number: 2:2017cv02435
Filed: September 18, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Jennifer D. McKee is substituted in place and stead of Karl O Riley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 8, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 10 Motion to Remand to State Court and 1 Petition for Removal. Responses due by 11/16/2017. William Rogers answer due 11/16/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 25, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 12 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 10 Motion to Remand to State Court and 1 Petition for Removal (First Request). Responses due by 11/13/2017. William Rogers answer due 11/10/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gould et al v. Rogers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audree Gould
Represented By: Tod R. Dubow
Represented By: Adam Ross Fulton
Represented By: Jared B. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Gould
Represented By: Tod R. Dubow
Represented By: Adam Ross Fulton
Represented By: Jared B. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Represented By: Karl O Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Rogers
Represented By: Karl O Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?