Vestin Realty Mortgage I, Inc. et al v. SL-FL NNN Industrial Portfolio I Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vestin Realty Mortgage I, Inc. and Vestin Realty Mortgage II, Inc.
Defendant: Jack Bixler, Trevor Gordon, SL-FL NNN Industrial Portfolio I Holdings, LLC and Sandlapper Capital Investments, LLC
Unknown: Gilbert W. Boyce
Case Number: 2:2017cv02530
Filed: September 28, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 24 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. In light of the circumstances and as a one-time courtesy to the parties, the Court will extend the deadlines in the scheduling order by 30 days as follows: Discovery due by 5/3/2018. Motions due by 6/2/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 17 Unopposed Motion re 11 , 12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - MR)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying without prejudice 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vestin Realty Mortgage I, Inc. et al v. SL-FL NNN Industrial Portfolio I Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Bixler
Represented By: James D. Boyle
Represented By: Nicole P. Moriarty
Represented By: Sean Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Gordon
Represented By: James D. Boyle
Represented By: Nicole P. Moriarty
Represented By: Sean Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SL-FL NNN Industrial Portfolio I Holdings, LLC
Represented By: James D. Boyle
Represented By: Nicole P. Moriarty
Represented By: Sean Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandlapper Capital Investments, LLC
Represented By: James D. Boyle
Represented By: Nicole P. Moriarty
Represented By: Sean Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Gilbert W. Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vestin Realty Mortgage I, Inc.
Represented By: Louis E Garfinkel
Represented By: Ira S. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vestin Realty Mortgage II, Inc.
Represented By: Louis E Garfinkel
Represented By: Ira S. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?