Bishop-Davis v. NV Energy, Inc
Plaintiff: Marilyn Bishop-Davis
Defendant: NV Energy, Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv02576
Filed: October 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 13 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply Re: 5 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 11/22/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. The court again schedules an ENE to commence December 13, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. in the chambers of the undersigned Magistrate Judge. The parties shall submit ENE statements no later than December 6, 2017. The order at Docket No. 7 continues to govern the ENE in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop-Davis v. NV Energy, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Bishop-Davis
Represented By: Guinness I Ohazuruike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NV Energy, Inc
Represented By: Roger L Grandgenett
Represented By: Karyn M Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?