Jaffey v. Del Taco Restaurants, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael Jaffey
Defendant: Del Taco Restaurants, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02600
Filed: October 5, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2018 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 14 , 15 Del Taco's motion to stay proceedings, or in the alternative, compel arbitration and dismiss the action be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 14, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 43 plaintiff's motion be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part. Plaintiff may file a surreply no later than 2/26/2018. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 29, 2018 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 41 Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing re 37 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Motion Hearing reset for 2/20/2018 at 09:45 AM in LV Courtroom 3B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 29, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Briefing Schedule on 14 Motion to Stay Case and 15 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/5/2018. Replies due by 1/26/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 26, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Del Taco Restaurants, Inc. answer due 11/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaffey v. Del Taco Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Taco Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Liam O'Gorman-Hoyt
Represented By: LeAnn Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jaffey
Represented By: Marc P Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?