McCollum-Gibson v. SFC of Nevada, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Demetrious McCollum-Gibson
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, SFC of Nevada, LLC and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02614
Filed: October 6, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to TransUnion, LLC. Case terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 30, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 1 Complaint. SFC of Nevada, LLC's answer due 12/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 16, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation to Extend Time re 1 Complaint. SFC of Nevada, LLC's answer due 11/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCollum-Gibson v. SFC of Nevada, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFC of Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Charles T. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrious McCollum-Gibson
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?