JS Products, Inc. v. Roller Clutch Tools, LLC

Plaintiff: JS Products, Inc.
Defendant: Roller Clutch Tools, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02615
Filed: October 6, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 18, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 36 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 30 Motion to Dismiss and 7 Motion to Enjoin (Third Request). Responses due by 2/2/2018. Replies due by 2/2/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 12, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 30 Motion to Dismiss and 7 Motion to Enjoin (Second Request). Responses due by 1/19/2018. Replies due by 1/19/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 29, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 30 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 1/5/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 22, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation re 1 Complaint and 7 Motion (Third Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JS Products, Inc. v. Roller Clutch Tools, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JS Products, Inc.
Represented By: Justin J. Gillett
Represented By: Sean M. Murray
Represented By: Craig A. Newby
Represented By: John B. Sganga, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua Stowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roller Clutch Tools, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Joe
Represented By: Michael D. Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?