Switch Ltd. v. Fairfax et al

Plaintiff: Switch Ltd.
Defendant: Stephen Fairfax and MTechnology
Case Number: 2:2017cv02651
Filed: October 12, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's fourth, fifth, and eighth causes of action with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 7 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 25, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 22 Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery Until the Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing currently set for July 2, 2018 regarding this motion (ECF No. 28 ) is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 12, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a hearing on Defendants' Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery Until the Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 22 ) is scheduled for 11:00 AM, July 2, 2018, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 4, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff by Ryan R Gile. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 6, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond/Reply re: 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Replies due by 12/12/2017; and 8 Motion to Dismiss: Responses due by 12/5/2017. Replies due by 12/12/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 19, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 8 Motion to Dismiss. See Order for Deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Switch Ltd. v. Fairfax et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Fairfax
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Represented By: Marc J Randazza
Represented By: Alex J. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTechnology
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Represented By: Marc J Randazza
Represented By: Alex J. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Switch Ltd.
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Samuel D Castor
Represented By: Ryan R Gile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?