Saubhayana v. Sessions et al
Plaintiff: Sathirawat Saubhayana
Defendant: Secretary DHS Elaine Duke, Al Gallmann, Jeanne Kent, James W. McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2017cv02655
Filed: October 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Extend Time re 37 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 8/14/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Extend Time to Answer or otherwise Plead to 34 Amended Complaint. Answer is now due 7/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 6/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 32 Motion to Extend Time re 31 Order (Third Request). Amended Complaint deadline: 5/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time re 29 Order. Amended Complaint deadline: 4/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 23 the defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Amended Complaint deadline: 3/12/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Motion to Extend Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Defendants answer due 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 10 Saubhayana's objection to 9 Magistrate Judge Foley's report and recommendation is SUSTAINED and the report and recommendation is REJECTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saubhayana v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary DHS Elaine Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Gallmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. McCament
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B. Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sathirawat Saubhayana
Represented By: Sylvia L. Esparza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?