Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Giavanna Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC, Giavanna Homeowners Association and Saticoy Bay LLC - Series 3665 Remington Grove
Case Number: 2:2017cv02677
Filed: October 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 80 Motion for Relief. The 64 Judgment in this case is VACATED. Parties are directed to file Dispositive Briefs by 4/29/2021. Responses due by 5/13/2021 and Replies due by 5/27/2021. The 81 Motion to Extend time is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/31/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 74 Stipulation; Re: 68 Motion for Reconsideration. Replies due by 9/10/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 52 Stipulation; Re: 48 Motion for Summary Judgment, Responses due by 10/24/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 28 Stipulation; Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Giavanna Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC
Represented By: Shane D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giavanna Homeowners Association
Represented By: Edward D Boyack
Represented By: Jason William Onello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saticoy Bay LLC - Series 3665 Remington Grove
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Represented By: Adam R Trippiedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Jason Joseph Zummo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?