Ousdale v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Ryan Ousdale
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 2:2017cv02749
Filed: October 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER denying 98 Motion in Limine; granting 99 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 100 Motion in Limine; granting 101 Motion in Limine; denying 102 Motion in Limine; denying 103 Motion in Limine; denying 104 Motion in Limine; denying 105 Motion in Limine; denying 106 Motion in Limine; granting 107 Motion in Limine; denying 108 Motion in Limine; denying 109 Motion in Limine; denying 110 Motion in Limine; denying 111 Motion in Limine; denying without Prejudice 112 Motion in Limine; denying without Prejudice 113 Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 114 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER that the prior 64 Order on Spoliation Sanctions remains unchanged. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER that the 80 and 81 Proposed Pretrial Orders are rejected. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/4/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting in part Defendant Target Corporation's 73 Motion for Reconsideration. Responses due by 9/6/2019. Replies due by 9/13/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Denying Defendant's 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's 62 Unopposed Motion for Spoliation Sanctions is Granted in part. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 59 and 61 Motions to Seal. Motion to Seal due 8/21/2019 otherwise Plaintiff's 60 Sealed Response and 62 Sealed Motion for Sanctions will be unsealed. Plaintiff must file under seal the Exhibits omitted from ECF Nos. 60 and 62 by 8/9/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 57 Stipulation Re: 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/22/2019. Replies due by 1/29/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 Stipulation to Stay Briefing; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's Responses due by 7/6/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 First Stipulation for Extension of Time of Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 8/13/2018. Motions due by 9/12/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that the Court Strikes Docket Nos. 13 and 14 and instructs the parties to refrain from filing discovery documents on the docket in the future absent a Court order that they do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ousdale v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Ousdale
Represented By: David A. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Kym S. Cushing
Represented By: Douglas M Rowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?