Lefrancis v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kathy A. Lefrancis
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Ditech Financial LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02780
Filed: November 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation of Dismissal of Experian Information Solutions, Inc., with Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation of Dismissal of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC with Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 37 Amended Complaint (Second Request). Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 5/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 41 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 37 Amended Complaint (First Request). Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 4/10/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 21 Amended Complaint (Second Request). Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 3/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 21 Amended Complaint (First Request). Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 3/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 23 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 21 Amended Complaint (Third Request). Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 2/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 17 Motion to Extend Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 1/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 1/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 1/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lefrancis v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy A. Lefrancis
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?