Williams v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Anna H. Williams
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02813
Filed: November 7, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
0 Judge: Richard F. Boulware
1 Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2018 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 2, 2018 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Stipulation; Discovery due by 8/6/2018. Motions due by 9/6/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 9, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 41 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Andrew Michael Cummings terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 13, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 25 Motion to Strike, 11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 22, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/30/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna H. Williams
Represented By: Michael Kind
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?