Hadden v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Stacy Hadden
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2017cv02817
Filed: November 8, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Clerk shall FILE the complaint (ECF No. 7 ). Clerk shall serve Commissioner SSA by sending a copy of the Summons and Complaint by certified mail to: Regional Chief Counsel; and U. S. Attorney General. (Cert Mail ## 7013 1710 0 001 6894 1597, and 7013 1710 0001 6894 1603) Clerk shall issue summons and deliver summons and complaint for service by USM on U.S. Attorney's Office, Reno. (Summons and complaint to USM on 10/23/2018.) Answer/res ponse to complaint due 60 days from date of service. Hence forth P shall serve D a copy every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 20, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff has until 1/19/2018 to correct the noted deficiencies in ECF No. 5 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 21, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk directed to file ECF No. 1 -1 Complaint and dismiss it with leave to amend. Amended Complaint due by 12/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hadden v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?