Doe v. United Airlines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02825
Filed: November 8, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2018 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 117 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 103 Motion for Sanctions (First Request). Responses due by 12/17/2018. Replies due by 12/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 11, 2018 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 114 Stipulation to Amend Complaint re 33 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 29, 2018 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 101 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court hereby SETS a hearing on that motion for 10:00 a.m. on 12/20/2018, in Courtroom 3B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 26, 2018 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 82 Motion to Compel, and Granting 83 Motion for Attorney Fees. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) Modified on 11/27/2018 to correct signatory Judge (MR).
November 19, 2018 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 96 Motion to Seal. The Clerk's office is INSTRUCTED to continue to maintain the subject filing under seal on an interim basis, however, as the Court will afford one final opportunity for Plaintiff to demonstrate cause for sealing. The renewed motion to seal shall be filed no later than 11/21/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 16, 2018 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 81 Motion for Sanctions. FURTHER ORDERED as follows: Defendant shall submit an affidavit of reasonable attorneys' fees and costs, incurred in bringing this motion no later than December 7, 2018; P laintiff shall have until December 14, 2018, to file a responsive memorandum; Plaintiff must, no later than November 26, 2018, comply in full with the Court's order at Docket No. 75 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 13, 2018 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 90 Response. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an unredacted declaration or, to the extent Plaintiff believes the document needs to be filed under seal, she must comply with the Court's order regarding filing documents under seal, Local Rule IA 10-5, and relevant Ninth Circuit caselaw, no later than 11/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 2, 2018 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 87 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 81 Motion for Sanctions, 82 Motion to Compel, 83 Motion for Attorney Fees (First Request). Responses due by 11/5/2018. Replies due by 11/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 24, 2018 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 66 Motion to Compel. The Court DENIES without prejudice Defendant's request for sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 10, 2018 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The motion hearing scheduled for 9/11/2018 regarding Docket No. 58 (Motion to Withdraw as Attorney) is VACATED in light of the filing at Docket No. 69 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 29, 2018 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED 63 Plaintiff's motion to amend caption is GRANTED. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to amend the caption of the instant case to substitute Plaintiff's initials K.D. for "Jane Doe." Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 24, 2018 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: 58 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2018 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Plaintiff's current counsel and any newly retained counsel shall appear in person. Any Response to the Motion due by 9/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 21, 2018 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part 49 Plaintiff's third motion for an order permitting her to proceed by pseudonym. No later than 8/28/2018, Plaintiff shall file a motion to amend that substitutes her initials for "Jane Doe." Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 3, 2018 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 49 Third Motion for an Order Permitting Plaintiff to Proceed by Pseudonym. Responses due by 8/7/2018. Replies due by 8/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 24, 2018 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file either a renewed motion to proceed pseudonymously or the appropriate motion to amend her name, no later than 7/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 7, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 14, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 12 Stipulation re Protective Order. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 11, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 7 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The Court hereby DENIES without prejudice 7 the parties' joint proposed discovery plan and scheduling order. The parties shall file a renewed joint proposed discovery plan and scheduling order that complies with the Court's local rules, no later than 12/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Bryan Naddafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Represented By: Andrew C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?