Pochampally v. Booth et al

Plaintiff: Radhika Pochampally
Defendant: Jane C. Ettinger Booth and Booth & Booth, APLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02895
Filed: November 17, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving ECF No. 24 Stipulation to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on ECF No. 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 9, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: 22 Joint Status Report seeking a stay of discovery. The parties shall file a stipulation addressing the standards applicable to such a request by 2/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 12, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 10 Motion to Dismiss and 12 Motion to Change Venue (Second Request). Responses due by 1/24/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 27, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 10 Motion to Dismiss, 12 Motion to Change Venue. Responses due by 1/10/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 29, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pochampally v. Booth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane C. Ettinger Booth
Represented By: Kaleb D. Anderson
Represented By: Joseph P Garin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booth & Booth, APLC
Represented By: Kaleb D. Anderson
Represented By: Joseph P Garin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radhika Pochampally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?