Haney-Williams v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al
Plaintiff: Devra Haney-Williams
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC and Sam's West, Inc.
Cross Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline
Cross Claimant: Sam's West, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02900
Filed: November 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting 113 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 108 Motion to Dismiss, Responses due by 2/22/2021. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting 90 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 82 Motion to Extend Time (Second Request). Replies due by 9/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ECF No. 83 was entered in error and is hereby withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 77 MOTION to Extend Time (Sixth or more Request) re 76 Order. Discovery due by 10/27/2020. Motions due by 12/4/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 41 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (see order for details); ORDER granting 43 Motion to Dismiss Amended Cross-Claim (see order for details); Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Denying 61 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. Petitioner shall file, within ten (10) days of the entry of this order, a verified petition that fully complies with the applicable local rules. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 50 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 43 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Replies due by 4/16/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 41 Motion to Dismiss (Second Request). Responses due by 4/9/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 41 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 4/2/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 30 Amended Complaint, 33 Crossclaim (First Request). Jubilant Cadista Pharmaceutcals, Inc. answer due 1/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian P. Johnson for GlaxoSmithKline LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Brian K. Terry. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haney-Williams v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: GlaxoSmithKline
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc.
Represented By: Pooja Kumar
Represented By: Robert K. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devra Haney-Williams
Represented By: Ross Heber Moynihan
Represented By: Leslie M Stovall
Represented By: Richard Waltjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Sam's West, Inc.
Represented By: Pooja Kumar
Represented By: Robert K. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?