Farmers Insurance Exchange v. TOTO USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Defendant: TOTO USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02906
Filed: November 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Re: 52 Joint Status Report. A stipulation to dismiss or a joint status report must be filed by 12/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 47 Motion to Remove Attorney Alexandria L. Layton from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 12/21/2018. Motions due by 1/21/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that 30 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is likewise granted leave to file its Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Daniel S. Rodman and Alexandria are substituted in the place of Michael J. Nunez and Tyler N. Ure for defendant Toto USA, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmers Insurance Exchange v. TOTO USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Kenneth W. Maxwell
Represented By: Micah Keir Mtatabikwa Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOTO USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Nunez
Represented By: Tyler N. Ure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?