Ames v. Caesars Entertainment Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Jay Ames
Defendant: Caesars Entertainment Corporation and Rio Properties LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02910
Filed: November 20, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard Fama for Caesars Entertainment Corporation and Rio Properties LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Lewis Brandon, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 21, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert A. Waller, Jr. for Jay Ames and approving Designation of Local Counsel Adam C. Rapaport. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/21/2017. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 4, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ames v. Caesars Entertainment Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Ames
Represented By: Adam C. Rapaport
Represented By: Robert A Waller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesars Entertainment Corporation
Represented By: Lewis W. Brandon, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Fama
Represented By: Justin Smerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Properties LLC
Represented By: Lewis W. Brandon, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Fama
Represented By: Justin Smerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?