Osby v. Williams et al
Petitioner: Gerald Osby
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian Williams
Case Number: 2:2017cv02956
Filed: November 28, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time. Amended Petition due by 5/9/2025. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/21/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JG)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the 62 motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Petitioner has up to and including, April 9, 2025, to file his amended petition. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/10/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 60 Motion to Extend Time. Amended Petition due by 3/10/2025. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/30/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL and denying as moot 55 Motion to Extend Time. Attorney Randal Boyd McDonald, III, Esq., is appointed as counsel for Osby. Mr. McDonald must enter a notice of appearance by 11/22/2024. Amended Petition due by 02/07/2025. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/13/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, CC: CJA Coordinator, NEF for all previously fillings regenerated and sent to Mr. McDonald. - MAM)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the 54 motion for appointment of counsel is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender is provisionally appointed as counsel and will have 30 days to (1) undertake direct representation of Osby by filing a notice of appearance or (2) indicate the office's inability to represent Osby in these proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to: - Electronically provide the Federal Public Defender a copy of this order, the 10 petition, and the 9 screening order, and; - Send a copy of this order to Osby and the CJA Coordinator for this division. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents' deadline to file a response to the petition is vacated until further order of the court. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/30/2024. (For Distribution by law library.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi - cc: CJA Coordinator)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying 46 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/18/2024. (For Distribution by law library.)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 34 the motion for stay and abeyance is GRANTED. This action is STAYED pending exhaustion of the unexhausted claims. Petitioner must return to this court with a motion to reopen within 45 days of the Nevada Supreme Court&# 039;s issuance of the remittitur at the conclusion of the state-court proceedings. Petitioner or respondents otherwise may move to reopen this action and seek any relief appropriate under the circumstances. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 35 the motion for transcripts of pleadings and other documents on file in this case is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Extend Time re 34 Motion to Stay Case (First Request). Responses due by 8/14/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 30 Motion to Strike; ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss; Osby has until August 5, 2019, to do one of the following (see order for details). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) Modified text on 7/5/2019 (JM).
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re: 19 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/6/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that 17 Motion for Enlargement of Time is GRANTED. Respondents will have through October 18, 2018, to file and serve a response to the petition (ECF No. 10 ). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 , 15 Motions to Extend Time. Respondents have until October 15, 2018, to file and serve a response to the petition (ECF No. 10 ). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents have until August 30, 2018, to file a response to Osby's habeas petition. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that 6 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Osby has until January 15, 2018, to PAY the $5.00 filing fee; failure to do so will result in this action being DISMISSED without further prior notice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osby v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerald Osby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?