McNamara v. Hallinan et al
Plaintiff: Thomas W. McNamara
Defendant: Charles M. Hallinan and Hallinan Capital Corp.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02966
Filed: November 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Granting 155 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 144 Defendants Motion to Stay, is GRANTED. The Court stays this case pending the United States Supreme Courts decision in AMG Capital Management, LLC v. Federal Trade Commission, No. 19-508. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Granting 140 Motion for Leave to Excuse Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER. The pending 136 Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part consistent with the above Re: 135 Order Setting Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER that the Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to strike the exhibits at Docket Nos. 108-3, 108-6, and 108-7. In all other respects, the 109 , 118 , and 121 motions to seal are DENIED. Except for the three exhibits stricken above, the Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to unseal Docket Nos. 108, 117, 120, and the exhibits thereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Re: 92 Motion to withdraw admissions. Motion Hearing reset for 10/16/2019 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Denying as moot Defendants' 47 Motion for Reconsideration and Denying as moot Defendants' 99 Motion for Stay. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Re: 92 Motion. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2019 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate. Declaration due by 9/6/19.Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Re: 88 Motion to Amend/Correct. Responses due by 5/9/2019. Replies due by 5/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 83 Unopposed Motion. Discovery due by 5/24/2019. Motions due by 8/9/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER that 65 Motion for Award of Expenses is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 70 Motion to Extend Time re: 68 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 2/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OMNIBUS TRANSFER ORDER. The undersigned judges hereby ORDER that each of these cases be TRANSFERRED and REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings: 2:17-cv-02966-KJD-NJK McNamara v. Hallinan, et al.2:17-cv-02967-JA D-PAL McNamara v. Hallinan, et al.2:17-cv-02968-JCM-NJK McNamara v. Patten, et al.2:17-cv-02969-JAD-CWH McNamara v. Selling Source, LLC, et al.FURTHER ORDERED that McNamara shall file a copy of this Order in any future suits he brings in this District in his capacity as Monitor pursuant to the Appointment Order in Fed. Trade Comm'n v. AMG Servs., Inc., 2:12-cv-00536-GMN-VCF (ECF No. 1099). Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/2/2018. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/2/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/2/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROTECTIVE ORDER, as amended, re 41 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Stipulation re Discovery. Discovery due by 2/20/2019. Motions due by 4/18/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule For Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that a Motion to Stay Discovery is due by 4/24/2018. Responses due by 4/26/2018. Replies due by 4/27/2018. The parties shall file a Discovery Plan by 4/27/2018 in the event the Court denies the Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 17 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 3/26/2018. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 3/21/2018 to correct typographical error (TR).
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 19 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re 17 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/12/2018. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. Charles M. Hallinan answer due 1/29/2018; Hallinan Capital Corp. answer due 1/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNamara v. Hallinan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles M. Hallinan
Represented By: Jarrod L. Rickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallinan Capital Corp.
Represented By: Jarrod L. Rickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. McNamara
Represented By: Edward T. Chang
Represented By: Michael F Lynch
Represented By: Logan D. Smith
Represented By: Logan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?