McNamara v. Selling Source, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Thomas W. McNamara
Defendant: DataX, Ltd., Derek LaFavor, London Bay Capital LLC, London Bay-TSS Acquisition Company, LLC, London Bay-TSS Holding Company, LLC, Glenn McKay, MoneyMutual, LLC, PartnerWeekly L.L.C. and Selling Source, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02969
Filed: November 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting 78 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery pending the ruling on Defendants' 53 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' 62 Motion to Stay Discovery and 76 Motion for a Status Conference are Denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 OMNIBUS TRANSFER ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this case is to be TRANSFERRED and REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that McNamara shall file a copy of this Order in any future suits he brings in this District in his capacity as Monitor pursuant to the Appointment Order in Fed. Trade Comm'n v. AMG Servs., Inc., 2:12-cv-00536-GMN-VCF (ECF No. 1099). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 First Stipulation re 52 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and for Extension of Time re 53 Motion to Dismiss. Responses to 53 Motion due by 6/29/2018. Replies due by 7/23/2018. Defendants have 3 days to submit a corrected image of the 54 Motion that complies with the rules of this court. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 44 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 34 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/30/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) Re: 1 Complaint. Defendant Derek LaFavor's answer due by 3/26/2018. Should the Defendant's initial response to the Complaint be a motion to dismiss, as anticipated by the parties, that Plaintiff's deadline to file its response to said motion is extended to 4/30/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNamara v. Selling Source, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DataX, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek LaFavor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: London Bay Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: London Bay-TSS Acquisition Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: London Bay-TSS Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MoneyMutual, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PartnerWeekly L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selling Source, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. McNamara
Represented By: Edward T. Chang
Represented By: Michael F Lynch
Represented By: Logan D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?