Vignolo v. Gentry et al

Petitioner: Leonard D Vignolo
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada, Jo Gentry and State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2017cv02976
Filed: November 30, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the petition shall be DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction as a successive petition. FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Jurists of reason would not find it debatable whether the Court's proc edural ruling dismissing the petition as a successive petition is correct, for the reasons discussed herein. The Clerk of Court shall enter final judgment accordingly, dismissing this action without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 23, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the portion of the prior order directing a response from respondents (ECF No. 9 , at 2, subparagraphs (b) and (c) in lines 2-5), is VACATED, such that no response is required from respondents until further order of this Court or a review ing court.FURTHER ORDERED that 3 , 7 , and 12 Petitioner's Motions for Appointment of Counsel are DENIED.FURTHER ORDERED that 8 and 11 Petitioner's Motions for an Extension of Time are GRANTED to the extent consistent with thi s order, such that petitioner shall have sixty (60) days from entry of this order within which to dispatch a response to the prior show-cause order (ECF No. 5 ). This action will be dismissed without further advance notice if petitioner does not tim ely respond or responds and fails to show cause why the petition should not be dismissed as a successive petition. The Clerk also shall SEND petitioner another additional copy of: (a) the show-cause order herein (ECF No. 5 ); and (b) ECF Nos. 18, 59, and 75 from No. 3:00-cv-00430-ECR-RAM. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 11, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that, within thirty days of entry of this order, respondents' counsel shall (a) enter a notice of appearance, (b) respond to the motion for an extension of time, and (c) specifically inform the Court (see order for details). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Copies pursuant to Order - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vignolo v. Gentry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jo Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leonard D Vignolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?