Strahl v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Robert E. Strahl
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02981
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 8, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 13 Notice of Settlement. ORDERED that the settling parties shall have until July 2, 2018, to either file a stipulation to dismiss with prejudice, or a joint status report advising when the stipulation to dismiss will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 21, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER RE 10 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strahl v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Strahl
Represented By: Michael Kind
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?