Valencia-Sandoval v. First Mortgage Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Jose M. Valencia-Sandoval
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and First Mortgage Corp.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02982
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 2, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 18 Notice of Settlement. ORDERED that plaintiff Jose M. Valencia-Sandoval and defendant First Mortgage Corp. shall file either a stipulation to dismiss or a status report on or before July 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 8, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Stipulation; First Mortgage Corp. answer due 1/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 2, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: 6 Notice of Settlement that a proposed stipulation and order for dismissal between Valencia-Sandoval and Equifax must be filed on or before February 28, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valencia-Sandoval v. First Mortgage Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Mortgage Corp.
Represented By: Thomas Beckom
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Valencia-Sandoval
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?