Strahl v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: Genoveva Strahl
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02983
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the settling parties shall have until 6/4/18, to either file a stipulation to dismiss with prejudice, or a joint status report advising when the stipulation to dismiss will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 30, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: The parties shall have until 5/25/18, to file a stipulation for dismissal or a joint status report indicating when the stipulation will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 29, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 17 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/12/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 16, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 17 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/29/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 5, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation to Extend Time. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 2/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 4, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Stipulation to Extend Time. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 1/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strahl v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genoveva Strahl
Represented By: Michael Kind
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?