Hyundai Motor America, Inc. et al v. Midwest Industrial Supply Company
Plaintiff: Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Hyundai Motor Company
Defendant: Midwest Industrial Supply Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv03010
Filed: December 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 122 defendants' motion for leave to file surreply be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 123 defendants motion to seal be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 124 , 125 plaintiffs' motion to seal be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 94 Defendants Midwest Industrial Supply Company and Alliance Automotive's Motion to Seal is DENIED, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 118 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal is DENIED, without p rejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the subject documents shall remain sealed. The parties may file renewed motions to seal no later than 6/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 80 defendants' motion to extend time be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 79 plaintiffs' motion to seal be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall have until 5/23/2019, to file a response to plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fees.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall seal exhibits C, E, I, J, K, L, and M of Kenneth E. Keller's declaration (ECF Nos. 77 -36, 77 -38, 77 -42, 77 -43, 77 -44, 77 -45, 77 -46). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 70 defendants' motion for clarification be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 60 , 61 plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fees be, and the same he reby is, DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 62 plaintiffs' motion to seal be, and the same hereby is, DENIED without prejudice. The clerk shall strike 60 , 61 , 62 plaintiffs' motions. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 58 plaintiffs' motion to amend be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. IS HEREBY ORDERED that 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file the amended complaint attached to its 28 Motion for Leave as Exhibit 1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion hearing set for 11/28/18 at 9:30 AM is hereby vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Midwest Industrial Supply Company answer due 5/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason R. Erb for Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Hyundai Motor Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel James J. Pisanelli. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher E. Stretch for Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Hyundai Motor Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel James J. Pisanelli. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyundai Motor America, Inc. et al v. Midwest Industrial Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Erb
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Represented By: Maria M Mercera
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Christopher E. Stretch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyundai Motor Company
Represented By: Jason Erb
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Represented By: Maria M Mercera
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Christopher E. Stretch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Industrial Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?