Fleming v. CIGNA Healthcare

Plaintiff: Catherine Fleming
Defendant: CIGNA Healthcare
Case Number: 2:2017cv03049
Filed: December 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) Re: 11 Partial Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/1/2018. Replies due by 3/8/2018. The hearing on this matter shall remain scheduled for 3/12/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation Re: 11 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS SO ORDERED that the Opposition to the Defendant's PartialMotion to Dismiss shall be due on 2/22/18. IT IS SO ORDERED that the Reply to the Opposition to the Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss shall be due on 3/8/18. IT IS SO ORDERED that the 2/23/18, hearing is VACATED and continued to MONDAY, 3/12/18, at 2 p.m. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation to Substitute Defendant. CIGNA Healthcare Dismissed with prejudice and Life Insurance Company of North America is substituted as the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Early Neutral Evaluation session scheduled for 2/14/18 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 10:00 AM, 3/1/18. The confidential statement is due by 4:00 PM, 2/22/18. All else as stated in 6 the Order scheduling the ENE remains unchanged.Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 5 Stipulation to Extend Time (First Request) Re: 1 Complaint. CIGNA Healthcare's answer due 1/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. CIGNA Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Fleming
Represented By: Jenny L Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?