Zorsch v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: George M. Zorsch
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mortgage Service Center, Silver State Schools Credit Union, Toyota Financial Services and Wells Fargo Card Services
Case Number: 2:2017cv03068
Filed: December 15, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Time. Silver State Schools Credit Union answer due 2/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 23, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation to Extend Time. Silver State Schools Credit Union answer due 2/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 16, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation to Extend Time. Silver State Schools Credit Union answer due 1/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 10, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation to Extend Time. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 2/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 2, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation to Extend Time. Wells Fargo Card Services answer due 1/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zorsch v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Service Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver State Schools Credit Union
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Card Services
Represented By: Tanya N. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George M. Zorsch
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?