U.S. Bank National Association v. City National Bank
Appellee: City National Bank
Appellant: U.S. Bank National Association
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2017cv03112
Filed: December 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the bankruptcy court's order be, and the same hereby is, AFFIRMED. The clerk is instructed to close the case accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 18 Stipulation; Answering brief due by 7/13/2018. Reply brief due by 7/27/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 11 Stipulation; Brief due by 6/8/2018. Answering brief due by 6/22/2018. Answering Appeal Brief due by 7/6/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying 7 Stipulation; ORDER denying 8 Stipulation; ORDER granting 9 Stipulation for extension of time; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. City National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: City National Bank
Represented By: Jeffrey R Hall
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Joseph S. Kistler
Represented By: Michael K Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Michael A DiGiacomo
Represented By: Joseph Sakai
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?