Zorsch v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sylvia Zorsch
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mortgage Service Center, Silver State Schools Credit Union and Toyota Financial Services
Case Number: 2:2017cv03121
Filed: December 27, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. Silver State Schools Credit Union answer due 2/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 2, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 12 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 19, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 2/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zorsch v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Service Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver State Schools Credit Union
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Zorsch
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?