Cooper v. Shoei Safety Helmet Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Kambra Cooper
Defendant: Shoei Company, LTD. and Shoei Safety Helmet Corporation
Case Number: 2:2017cv03129
Filed: December 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that Plaintiff must file proof of service for ShoeiCompany, Ltd. within 14 days of this order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the claims against Shoei and because it is the only remaining defendant, closure of this case without additional notice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting SSHC's 8 Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. Plaintiff's claims against Shoei Safety Helmet Corp. are dismissed without prejudice, and she may file an amended complaint within 20 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that the parties file a stipulated Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 7/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Shoei Safety Helmet Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kambra Cooper
Represented By: Nadine Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoei Company, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoei Safety Helmet Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?