U.S. Bank Trust v. Guevara et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Defendant: Citibank, N.A. and Warren M Guevara
Case Number: 2:2018cv00004
Filed: January 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. and against Defendant Warren M Guevara. As a result of Defendant's default under the note, as secured by the Deed of Trust, Plaintiff may foreclose on the property. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Default Judgment. U.S. Bank shall prepare and submit a Proposed Judgment within 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 15 Second Motion to Extend Time to Effectuate Service. The Court extends the time for service to 6/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Plaintiff must file a certificate of interested parties no later than 1/12/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust v. Guevara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren M Guevara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Christine A Roberts
Represented By: Nathan F Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?