Ziegler v. Las Vegas Monorail Company, et al

Plaintiff: Bonnie Ziegler
Defendant: Las Vegas Monorail Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00049
Filed: January 9, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 2, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 16 Defendant's Emergency Request for Exception to Early Neutral Evaluation Attendance Requirements is granted. Defendant is instructed to have the insurance representative be available by telephone as needed. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file her opposition, if any, to Defendant's request no later than May 3, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 21, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation to Reschedule the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference (First Request). Early Neutral Evaluation Conference rescheduled for 5/7/2018 at 09:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Confidential written statements shall be submitted to chambers no later than 4/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 5, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Stipulation to Extend Time (First Request) Re: 1 Complaint. Las Vegas Monorail Company's answer due 2/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziegler v. Las Vegas Monorail Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Monorail Company
Represented By: Deverie J. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Ziegler
Represented By: Maile Lani Esteban-Trinidad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?