Fioravante et al v. Leica Microsystems, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Fioravante and Modern Orthopaedics, LLC
Defendant: Brandon Elggren, Leica Microsystems, Inc., Steve Milazzo and South Ridge Microsurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00059
Filed: January 10, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties must file a stipulated dismissal or submit a joint status report via facsimile to 702-464-5581 by 7/20/2018. Failure to comply with this order will result in the issuance of an order to show cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 24, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer/Respond re: 3 Amended Complaint. Leica Microsystems, Inc. answer due 5/7/2018; Steve Milazzo answer due 5/7/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 9, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Third Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 3 Amended Complaint. Leica Microsystems, Inc. and Steve Milazzo's answer due 4/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 27, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 1 Complaint. Brandon Elggren and South Ridge Microsurgical, Inc.'s answer due 4/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 23, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 3 Amended Complaint. Leica Microsystems, Inc. answer due 4/9/2018; Steve Milazzo answer due 4/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 27, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) Re: 3 Amended Complaint. Defendants Brandon Elggren and South Ridge Microsurgical, Inc.'s answer due 3/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 23, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) Re: 3 Amended Complaint. Defendants Leica Microsystems, Inc. and Steve Milazzo answer due 3/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fioravante et al v. Leica Microsystems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Elggren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leica Microsystems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Milazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Ridge Microsurgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Fioravante
Represented By: Maile Lani Esteban-Trinidad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modern Orthopaedics, LLC
Represented By: Maile Lani Esteban-Trinidad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?