Marshall et al v. Rogers et al

Plaintiff: Chris Cheng, Winston Cheng, Daniel Dykes, Colin Marshall and Caroline Ventola
Defendant: AIRBNB, Inc., Barbara Rogers, Christopher Gregory Rogers, Dannie Earl Rogers, Rogers Holdings, II, LLC and The Rogers Family Trust
Case Number: 2:2018cv00078
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2018 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 64 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 56 Motion to Stay Discovery (Second Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 13, 2018 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 62 Stipulation to Continue Hearing and Stay Discovery Re: 56 Motion to Stay Discovery. Responses due by 6/18/2018. Replies due by 6/22/2018. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2018 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 6, 2018 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 57 Motion to Shorten Time Re: 56 Motion to Stay Discovery. Responses due by 6/11/2018. Replies due by 6/14/2018. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2018 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 24, 2018 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice Airbnbs 8 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Denying without prejudice Airbnb's 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 2, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Continue Hearing. The hearing on the motion for determination of good faith settlement 23 is reset for 4/25/2018 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
January 19, 2018 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Stipulation to Extend Time. AIRBNB, Inc. answer due 2/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall et al v. Rogers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIRBNB, Inc.
Represented By: Laura R. Jacobsen
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Gregory Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dannie Earl Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers Holdings, II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rogers Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Cheng
Represented By: Christopher D Kircher
Represented By: Jarrod L. Rickard
Represented By: Semenza Kircher Rickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston Cheng
Represented By: Christopher D Kircher
Represented By: Jarrod L. Rickard
Represented By: Semenza Kircher Rickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Dykes
Represented By: Christopher D Kircher
Represented By: Jarrod L. Rickard
Represented By: Semenza Kircher Rickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Marshall
Represented By: Christopher D Kircher
Represented By: Jarrod L. Rickard
Represented By: Semenza Kircher Rickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Ventola
Represented By: Christopher D Kircher
Represented By: Jarrod L. Rickard
Represented By: Semenza Kircher Rickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?