Edwards v. Vehicle Protection Department, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Paul D.S. Edwards
Defendant: Reticulated Administrative Services, Inc., American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, Ruben Santos Martin, American Security Insurance Company, Dennis McNair Fantis, Jason Rhoden, VEHICLE PROTECTION DEPARTMENT, LLC, John August Frobose, John Pappanastos, Katherine A. McDonald, Brickell Financial Services-Motor Club Inc., EFG Companies, John Frobose, Brickell Financial Services-Motor Club Inc. doing business as Road America Motor Club, Inc. doing business as Road America Motor Club, JR Rhoden, Dennis M. Fantis, EFG Companies doing business as EFG Agency, Inc. doing business as EFGUSA.com doing business as Enterprise Financial Group, Inc. and Dennis Mc Nair Fantis
Case Number: 2:2018cv00125
Filed: January 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A Leen
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Civil Case Terminated per #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MR)
January 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Withdrawal re #6 Notice of Errata by Paul D.S. Edwards. (MR)
January 25, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of ERRATA to #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Paul D.S. Edwards. (MR)
January 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Paul D.S. Edwards. (MR)
January 24, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/24/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/8/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Frank G. Burt and Brian P. Perryman to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 3/10/2018. (no image attached) (MR)
January 23, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MR)
January 23, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc., Corporate Parent Interfinancial, Inc. for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company added. (Lower, Ryan)
January 23, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-17-765684-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-4940404) by American Security Insurance Company, John August Frobose, Katherine A. McDonald, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. Proof of service due by 3/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Lower, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Vehicle Protection Department, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reticulated Administrative Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Represented By: Ryan M. Lower
Represented By: Brian P. Perryman
Represented By: Frank G. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Santos Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan M. Lower
Represented By: Brian P. Perryman
Represented By: Frank G. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis McNair Fantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Rhoden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VEHICLE PROTECTION DEPARTMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John August Frobose
Represented By: Ryan M. Lower
Represented By: Brian P. Perryman
Represented By: Frank G. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pappanastos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine A. McDonald
Represented By: Ryan M. Lower
Represented By: Brian P. Perryman
Represented By: Frank G. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brickell Financial Services-Motor Club Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EFG Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Frobose
Represented By: Ryan M. Lower
Represented By: Brian P. Perryman
Represented By: Frank G. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brickell Financial Services-Motor Club Inc. doing business as Road America Motor Club, Inc. doing business as Road America Motor Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JR Rhoden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis M. Fantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EFG Companies doing business as EFG Agency, Inc. doing business as EFGUSA.com doing business as Enterprise Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Mc Nair Fantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul D.S. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?