Nilsen v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tawnya Nilsen
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Santander Consumer U.S.A., Inc. and Transunion, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00272
Filed: February 13, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that, absent leave for an extension being granted, the responses to a discovery motion shall be filed within 4 days of the service of that motion and any reply shall be filed within 2 days of the service of the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 1, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 9/4/2018. Motions due by 10/4/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 27, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court DENIES without prejudice 20 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. A renewed proposed discovery plan and scheduling order shall be filed no later than April 30, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 8, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Stipulation; Transunion, LLC answer due 4/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nilsen v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: Andrew J Sharples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion, LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawnya Nilsen
Represented By: Jamie S Cogburn
Represented By: Erik-Anthony W Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?