Bank of America, N.A. v. Giavanna Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Giavanna Homeowners Association, SBW Investments LLC and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00288
Filed: February 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the $500 deposit be refunded in accordance with the certificate of cash deposit, ECF No. 21, to: Akerman, LLP c/o Vatana Lay, Esq., 1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200, Las Vegas, NV 89134. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - ADR)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 22 Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that 34 Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED as moot. IT IS ORDERED that [ 35] Defendant SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED at moot. IT IS ORDERED that 37 Defendant Giavanna Homeowners Association's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice as moot. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants on all claims and close this matter accordingly. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation to Briefing Deadlines for Motions for Summary Judgment. Motions due by 12/10/2018. Responses due by 1/7/2019. Replies due by 1/22/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Stipulated Protective Order; Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Giavanna Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Vatana Lay
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giavanna Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBW Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana S. Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?