Vandiver v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Rosa G. Vandiver
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv00362
Filed: February 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 18 Motion to Remand ; ORDER granting 25 Countermotion to Affirm the Agency Decision; Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 18 Motion to Remand to Agency. Responses due by 9/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 18 Motion to Remand to Agency. Responses due by 8/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The Clerk of Court must file the Complaint and Issue Summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vandiver v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Gina Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa G. Vandiver
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?