Giumarra Bros. Fruit Co., Inc et al v. Paradise Produce LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bonita Packing Co. and Giumarra Bros. Fruit Co., Inc.
Defendant: Eugene J Hickey, Paradise Produce LLC, Michael K. Rosenblum, William H. Rosenblum and West Central, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00395
Filed: March 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of court shall close this case, without prejudice to the plaintiffs moving to reopen the case once defendant Paradise Produce, LLC's bankruptcy proceedings have concluded or the automatic stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER for Status Report. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Striking 60 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Any renewed papers must be filed in accordance with the local rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. The Court hereby STAYS this case as to Defendant Paradise Produce ONLY, pending either the lifting of the stay or resolution of its bankruptcy proceeding. Defendant Paradise Produce shall file a status report in the instant case, regarding its bankruptcy case and the stay, every 30 days, beginning 9/6/2018. The Court DENIES 34 Plaintiffs' motion and ORDERS all other parties to file a joint proposed discovery plan and scheduling order, no later than 8/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Motion to Extend Time re 6 Amended Complaint (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giumarra Bros. Fruit Co., Inc et al v. Paradise Produce LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonita Packing Co.
Represented By: Michael A. Hagemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giumarra Bros. Fruit Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Hagemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene J Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Produce LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Central, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?