Aristocrat Technologies, Inc. et al v. AGS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Aristocrat International Pty Ltd., Aristocrat Technologies Australia Pty Ltd and Aristocrat Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: AGS, LLC and PlayAGS, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00396
Filed: March 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. The Court, however, declines to retain jurisdiction to enforce the parties' Settlement Agreement. Case terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Motion to Stay Case. ORDERED that this case is STAYED. All pending deadlines are hereby extended by thirty (30) days from the signing of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 9 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. AGS, LLC answer due 4/11/2018; PlayAGS, Inc. answer due 4/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aristocrat Technologies, Inc. et al v. AGS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGS, LLC
Represented By: Craig J. Mariam
Represented By: Robert E Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PlayAGS, Inc.
Represented By: Craig J. Mariam
Represented By: Robert E Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aristocrat International Pty Ltd.
Represented By: Ethan Clark Forrest
Represented By: Simon James Frankel
Represented By: Rebecca A. Jacobs
Represented By: Gary Rubman
Represented By: Nicholas J Santoro
Represented By: Jason D Smith
Represented By: Peter A Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aristocrat Technologies Australia Pty Ltd
Represented By: Ethan Clark Forrest
Represented By: Simon James Frankel
Represented By: Rebecca A. Jacobs
Represented By: Gary Rubman
Represented By: Nicholas J Santoro
Represented By: Jason D Smith
Represented By: Peter A Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aristocrat Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Ethan Clark Forrest
Represented By: Simon James Frankel
Represented By: Rebecca A. Jacobs
Represented By: Gary Rubman
Represented By: Nicholas J Santoro
Represented By: Jason D Smith
Represented By: Peter A Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?