Ondrisek et al v. US Immigration Service

Plaintiff: Vaclav Ondrisek and Vanessa Ondrisek
Defendant: US Immigration Service
Case Number: 2:2018cv00411
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Stipulation. Case stay lifted. The deadline for the United States to file its responsive pleading shall be Monday, February 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Stipulation Re: 8 Amended Complaint. US Immigration Service answer due 1/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Time re: 8 Amended Complaint. US Immigration Service answer due 12/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: 8 First Amended Complaint. The court will not enter a screening order on the amended complaint. This case shall proceed on the normal litigation track as governed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Ryan A. Hamilton, Esq. is hereby appointed as pro bono counsel for Plaintiffs VACLAV ONDRISEK and VANESSA ONDRISEK pursuant to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada's Pro Bono Program. FURTHER ORDERED that with in fourteen (14) days after completion legal services, Ryan A. Hamilton, Esq. must submit a Notice of Completion Form to the Pro Bono Liaison. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to the Pro Bono Program for appointment of counsel for the purposes identified herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk forwards this order to the Pro Bono Liaison. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ondrisek et al v. US Immigration Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaclav Ondrisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Ondrisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Immigration Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?