Aladdin's Eatery Systems, Inc. v. PHWLV, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Aladdin's Eatery Systems, Inc.
Defendant: OPBIZ, LLC, and PHWLV, LLC,
Case Number: 2:2018cv00412
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1127 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 69 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to PHWLV, LLC; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 Stipulation to respond to Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Fourth STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant PHWLV, LLC to Respond or Plead to 31 Amended Complaint. PHWLV, LLC, answer due 9/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 Stipulation; PHWLV, LLC, answer due 8/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Stipulation; PHWLV, LLC, answer due 7/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 49 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond to 31 Amended Complaint: PHWLV, LLC, answer due 6/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 41 Stipulation; Re: 40 Motion to Dismiss, Responses due by 7/24/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Stipulation; PHWLV, LLC, answer due 6/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 Stipulation; PHWLV, LLC, answer due 5/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 21 Motion to Dismiss; AES may file an amended complaint within 21 days of this order. If it chooses not to, this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 21 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/6/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Extend Time; PHWLV, LLC, answer due 6/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Stipulation; PHWLV, LLC, answer due 5/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aladdin's Eatery Systems, Inc. v. PHWLV, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aladdin's Eatery Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Cogan
Represented By: Edward Tufic Saadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPBIZ, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHWLV, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?