Roche v. Navy Federal Credit Union et al

Plaintiff: Pamela J. Roche
Defendant: Boulder Dam Federal Credit Union, Equifax Information Services, LLC., Navy Federal Credit Union, Synchrony Bank and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00434
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 1 Complaint. Boulder Dam Federal Credit Union's answer due 5/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 1, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 18 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 1 Complaint. Synchrony Bank's answer due 5/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 11, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 1 Complaint. Synchrony Bank's answer due 5/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 10, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 12 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 1 Complaint. Boulder Dam Federal Credit Union's answer due 5/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 3, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 1 Complaint. Navy Federal Credit Union's answer due 4/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 27, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) Re: 1 Complaint. Trans Union, LLC's answer due 5/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roche v. Navy Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Dam Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Robert S. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J. Roche
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?