Federal Trade Commission v. AWS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: AWS, LLC, Adams Consulting, LLC, Adam S Bowser, Christopher F Bowser, FBA Distributors, LLC, FBA Stores, LLC, Global Marketing Services, LLC, Jeffery A. Gomez, Info Pros, LLC, Info Solutions, LLC, Jody Marshall and Online Auction Learning Center, Inc
Receiver: Robb Evans & Associates LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00442
Filed: March 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER The clerk shall close this case on October 30, 2020, unless either party files a written objection by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, October 29, 2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 125 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Bank of America, N.A.'s Complaint in Intervention; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 119 Stipulation to Extend Date of Settlement Payment; Payment due 7/31/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 106 Stipulation for Response to Complaint-Intervention; Response due 60 days from date of Intervention Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 86 Stipulation for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment as to Defendants Adams Consulting, LLC, Global Marketing Services, LLC., and Jeffrey A. Gomez; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 95 Stipulation Allowing Bank of America, N.A. to Intervene and File Complaint; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting Stipulation for Qualified Turnover of Reserve Funds. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 78 Stipulation for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment (see order for details); Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 77 Stipulation Extending the duration of the TRO and Vacating 7/10/2018 Hearing; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 68 Stipulation; Re: 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 6/22/2018. Replies due by 6/29/2018. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2018 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 64 Stipulation to Vacate Real Property and Reject Real Property Leases; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 61 Stipulation; Re: 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 5/25/2018. Replies due by 6/1/2018. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Re: 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing reset for 5/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Stipulated Temporary Restraining Order; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Stipulation; Re: 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 4/20/2018. Replies due by 4/27/2018. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2018 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Withdrawal of 44 Motion, Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 33 Stipulation; Re: 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Proposed preliminary injunction order due by 3/30/2018. Responses due by 4/6/2018. Replies due by 4/13/2018. Motion Hearing reset for 4/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. AWS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AWS, LLC
Represented By: LaTeigra C. Cahill
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam S Bowser
Represented By: LaTeigra C. Cahill
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher F Bowser
Represented By: LaTeigra C. Cahill
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBA Distributors, LLC
Represented By: LaTeigra C. Cahill
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBA Stores, LLC
Represented By: LaTeigra C. Cahill
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Marketing Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery A. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Info Pros, LLC
Represented By: LaTeigra C. Cahill
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Info Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Marshall
Represented By: LaTeigra C. Cahill
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Online Auction Learning Center, Inc
Represented By: LaTeigra C. Cahill
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Roberto Anguizola
Represented By: Gregory Evans
Represented By: Miry Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Robb Evans & Associates LLC
Represented By: Gary Owen Caris
Represented By: Michael F Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?