Tucker v. MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.

Plaintiff: Karla Tucker
Defendant: MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00443
Filed: March 12, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the ENE scheduled for 10/15/18, is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file a stipulation and order for dismissal on or before 11/13/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 20, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing regarding the Early Neutral Evaluation, is scheduled for 1:00 PM, 9/24/18, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 9, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Early Neutral Evaluation Session scheduled for 8/22/18 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 9/6/18 at 10:00 AM. The confidential statement is due by 4:00 PM, 8/30/18. All else as stated in the Order setting the ENE remains the same (ECF NO. 24 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 6, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation to Stay Litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Bolliger Crespo
Represented By: Sandra Ketner
Represented By: Heather Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Tucker
Represented By: Jenny L Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?