Betten v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Robert D. Betten
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv00536
Filed: March 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 31 the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED and AFFIRMED. Plaintiff Robert Betten's 21 Motion to Remand to the Social Security Administration is GRANTED, and Commissioner Saul's 26 Countermotion to Affirm the Agency's Decision is DENIED. This case is hereby REMANDED to the Social Security Agency for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that the Clerk's Office is instructed to substitute Andrew Saul in place of Nancy Berryhill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 21 Motion to Remand to Agency. Responses are extended 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Jenna Barson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: 9 Order to Show Cause. The Court hereby ADMONISHES Plaintiff and his attorneys (Jenna Barson and John Shook) for failing to comply with clear deadlines. The Court expects strict compliance with deadlines moving forward and failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions, up to and including dismissal.The Court will extend the deadline to effectuate service through August 20, 2018. A proof of service shall be filed by that date.In all other respects, the order to show cause is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to issue the proposed summonses as appropriate and Plaintiff is ORDERED to effectuate service as required by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The order to show cause at Docket No. 3 is DISCHARGED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. Any renewed application to proceed in forma pauperis must be made on the long form (AO 239) to ensure that both Plaintiff's and his spouse's income, assets, and liabilities are properly considered. Any such application shall be filed by April 16, 2018. Alternatively, Plaintiff may pay the filing fee by April 16, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betten v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Betten
Represented By: Jenna Barson
Represented By: John B. Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?