Universal Entertainment Corporation v. Aruze Gaming America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Universal Entertainment Corporation
Defendant: Aruze Gaming America, Inc. and Kazuo Okada
Case Number: 2:2018cv00585
Filed: March 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER Granting 347 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 316 Motion to Compel (Second Request). Replies due by 5/13/2021. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER Granting 344 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 321 Motion for Sanctions (Second Request). Responses due by 5/7/2021. Replies due by 5/28/2021. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER Granting 332 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 318 Motion to Seal, 321 Motion for Sanctions (First Request). See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER Granting in part 311 Motion to Strike. No later than 3/15/2021, Plaintiff must file a sur-reply in support of its opposition to Defendants' pending 276 motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER Denying without prejudice 282 Motion to Seal. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER Denying without prejudice 263 , 278 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER re 282 Motion to Seal. Defendants are hereby ORDERED to file either a declaration establishing sufficient justification, with appropriate caselaw citations, for sealing each requested document or a notice of withdrawal of the confidential designation, no later than 2/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER Granting 281 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 276 Motion to Compel (First Request). Responses due by 2/5/2021. Replies due by 2/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 262 Motion to Seal. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting 271 Stipulation; Re: 263 Motion to Compel, 262 Motion to Seal. Responses to 262 due by 1/4/2021. Responses to 263 due by 1/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER Granting 250 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 223 Minutes of Proceedings (First Request). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting 248 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to file Replies to 234 Motion to Amend/Correct and 233 Motion to Compel. Replies due by 11/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER Granting 242 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 233 , 234 Motions (First Request). Replies due by 11/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER Granting 235 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 232 Order (Sixth Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER Granting 220 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Granting 205 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 50 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Second Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER Regarding 202 Order on Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER denying in part 60 Motion to Dismiss; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER Granting in Part 134 , 141 Motions to Modify Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Granting 187 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 181 Motion to Compel (First Request). Responses due by 4/20/2020. Replies due by 5/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 119 Defendants Aruze Gaming America, Inc. and Kazuo Okada's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and 120 Motion for Preliminary Injunction are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 118 Defendants Aruze Gaming America, Inc. and Kazuo Okada's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction in accordance with Rule 5.2(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is GRANTED, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 133 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting 65 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 59 , 60 Motions to Dismiss. Replies due by 2/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 56 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 50 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 36 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order; Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Submit Proposed Protective Order to 8/13/2018; Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 13 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 7/3/2018. Replies due by 7/31/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to 1 Complaint. Answer due 5/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Entertainment Corporation v. Aruze Gaming America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aruze Gaming America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kazuo Okada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Entertainment Corporation
Represented By: David W Gutke
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Represented By: Andrew Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?